Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9913943 | Global Dossier | 25.03.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP25581497 | 19.09.1997 | US97284697 | 18.11.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US61110596 | 05.03.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9848711 | Global Dossier | 05.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4526897 | 01.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0113357 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37464299 | 16.08.1999 | US37516299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0007508 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0000095 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014343483 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414289528 | 28.05.2014 | US201113332226 | 20.12.2011 | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | US36927003 | 18.02.2003 | US41849106 | 03.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014155814 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4526897 | 01.05.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US7128598 | 01.05.1998 | US38329203 | 06.03.2003 | US201113333922 | 21.12.2011 | US201414170419 | 31.01.2014 | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | US37516299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8690818 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2014 | B2 | US2012095389 | 19.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4526897 | 01.05.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US7128598 | 01.05.1998 | US38329203 | 06.03.2003 | US201113333922 | 21.12.2011 | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | US37516299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8764700 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2014 | B2 | US2012089082 | 12.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113332226 | 20.12.2011 | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | US36927003 | 18.02.2003 | US41849106 | 03.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009105633 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97284697 | 18.11.1997 | JP25581497 | 19.09.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US15831698 | 21.09.1998 | US61110596 | 05.03.1996 | US62070100 | 20.07.2000 | JP4871095 | 08.03.1995 | US30586502 | 26.11.2002 | US62029603 | 15.07.2003 | US25229108 | 15.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7914509 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2011 | B2 | US2007149917 | 28.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4526897 | 01.05.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US7128598 | 01.05.1998 | US38329503 | 06.03.2003 | US70718907 | 15.02.2007 | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | US37516299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007112268 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | US36927003 | 18.02.2003 | US41849106 | 03.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7976483 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2011 | B2 | US2005010112 | 13.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4526897 | 01.05.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US7128598 | 01.05.1998 | US73558803 | 12.12.2003 | US37464299 | 16.08.1999 | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | US37516299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004229830 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97284697 | 18.11.1997 | JP25581497 | 19.09.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US15831698 | 21.09.1998 | US61110596 | 05.03.1996 | US78238304 | 19.02.2004 | US62070100 | 20.07.2000 | JP4871095 | 08.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004059313 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97284697 | 18.11.1997 | JP25581497 | 19.09.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US15831698 | 21.09.1998 | US61110596 | 05.03.1996 | US62070100 | 20.07.2000 | JP4871095 | 08.03.1995 | US30586502 | 26.11.2002 | US62029603 | 15.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004015122 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | US36927103 | 18.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7413556 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2008 | B2 | US2003216681 | 20.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | US36927003 | 18.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003167023 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4526897 | 01.05.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US7128598 | 01.05.1998 | US38329203 | 06.03.2003 | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | US37516299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7186246 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2007 | B2 | US2003153833 | 14.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4526897 | 01.05.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US7128598 | 01.05.1998 | US38329503 | 06.03.2003 | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | US37516299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH08245420 | Global Dossier | 24.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4871095 | 08.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4791616B | Global Dossier | 12.10.2011 | B2 | JPH1192360 | 06.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25581497 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3955897B | Global Dossier | 08.08.2007 | B2 | JPH11504534 | 27.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9603010 | 06.03.1996 | US61110596 | 05.03.1996 | JP4871095 | 08.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003507105 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0021302 | 04.08.2000 | US37464299 | 16.08.1999 | US37516299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002522108 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9915463 | 08.07.1999 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4890674B | Global Dossier | 07.03.2012 | B2 | JP2002519095 | 02.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9914757 | 29.06.1999 | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1206771 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0021302 | 04.08.2000 | US37464299 | 16.08.1999 | US37516299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1100385 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2006 | B1 | EP1100385 | 23.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9915463 | 08.07.1999 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1091699 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2005 | B1 | EP1091699 | 18.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9914757 | 29.06.1999 | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9500598 | Global Dossier | 05.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25581497 | 19.09.1997 | US97284697 | 18.11.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US9819797 | 21.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5183096 | Global Dossier | 23.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US9603010 | 06.03.1996 | US61110596 | 05.03.1996 | JP4871095 | 08.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0814719 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2003 | B1 | EP0814719 | 07.01.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9603010 | 06.03.1996 | US61110596 | 05.03.1996 | JP4871095 | 08.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69630285T | 15.07.2004 | T2 | DE69630285D1 | 13.11.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9603010 | 06.03.1996 | US61110596 | 05.03.1996 | JP4871095 | 08.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69925122T | 19.01.2006 | T2 | DE69925122D1 | 09.06.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9914757 | 29.06.1999 | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69929523T | 24.08.2006 | T2 | DE69929523D1 | 06.04.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9915463 | 08.07.1999 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003092667 | 15.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97284697 | 18.11.1997 | JP25581497 | 19.09.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US15831698 | 21.09.1998 | US61110596 | 05.03.1996 | US24632302 | 18.09.2002 | US62070100 | 20.07.2000 | JP4871095 | 08.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003157024 | 21.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97284697 | 18.11.1997 | JP25581497 | 19.09.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US15831698 | 21.09.1998 | US61110596 | 05.03.1996 | US62070100 | 20.07.2000 | JP4871095 | 08.03.1995 | US30586502 | 26.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6001069 | 14.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US4526897 | 01.05.1997 | US7128598 | 01.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6176842 | 23.01.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US97284697 | 18.11.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US15831698 | 21.09.1998 | US61110596 | 05.03.1996 | JP4871095 | 08.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6210356 | 03.04.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6527759 | 04.03.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US97284697 | 18.11.1997 | JP25581497 | 19.09.1997 | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US15831698 | 21.09.1998 | US61110596 | 05.03.1996 | US62070100 | 20.07.2000 | JP4871095 | 08.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6582392 | 24.06.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US7128598 | 01.05.1998 | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | US37516299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6676626 | 13.01.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US12998098 | 05.08.1998 | US7128598 | 01.05.1998 | US37464299 | 16.08.1999 | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | US37516299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6723063 | 20.04.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US10707898 | 29.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9627341 | Global Dossier | 12.09.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61110596 | 05.03.1996 | JP4871095 | 08.03.1995 |