EP0814719 - ULTRASOUND THERAPY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ekos Corporation Suite 148, 22122 20th Avenue S.E. Bothell, WA 98021 / US | [1998/21] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states Ekos, LLC 234 Alverson Boulevard Everett, WA 98201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TACHIBANA, Katsuro 6-18, Kusagae 1-chome, Chuo-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 810 / JP | 02 /
TACHIBANA, Shunro 6-18, Kusagae 1-chome, Chuo-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 810 / JP | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Horner, David Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Horner, David Richard, et al D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1998/02] | Horner, David Richard, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 96908664.4 | 06.03.1996 | [1998/02] | WO1996US03010 | Priority number, date | JP19950048710 | 08.03.1995 Original published format: JP 4871095 | US19960611105 | 05.03.1996 Original published format: US 611105 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9627341 | Date: | 12.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0814719 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0814719 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00, A61N7/00 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
A61N7/00 (EP);
A61K41/0047 (EP);
A61M37/0092 (EP);
A61B17/2202 (EP);
A61B2017/00853 (EP);
A61B2017/22002 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1998/02] | A61B19/00, A61N7/00, A61B17/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/02] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLTHERAPIEVORRICHTUNG | [1998/02] | English: | ULTRASOUND THERAPY DEVICE | [1998/02] | French: | APPAREIL A ULTRASONS A USAGE THERAPEUTIQUE | [1998/02] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 10.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.10.2003 | NL | 08.10.2003 | ES | 19.01.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/46] | NL | 08.10.2003 | |
ES | 19.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | NL | 08.10.2003 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US5158071 (UMEMURA ET AL.) [YD] 1-27 * claim 1 *; | [Y]DE3919592 (OLYMPUS) [Y] 1-9,18 * claims 14,15 *; | [Y]WO9207622 (TURNER ET AL.) [Y] 10-17,19-27 * page 30, line 6 - line 21; claim 1 *; | [A]US4971991 (UMEMURA ET AL.) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5149319 (UNGER) [A] 1 * claim 1 * | Examination | WO9308738 | US4582067 | EP0668052 |