EP1007429 - SNAP-LOCKING CLOSURE DEVICE FOR A BEER BARREL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gevaplast Heyveldstraat 217 9040 Gent / BE | [2000/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEVAERT, Patrick Vossenberglaan 10 B-9070 Destelbergen / BE | 02 /
DEMIL, Marnix Watermuntstraat 32 B-9032 Wondelgem / BE | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Petsis, Christos 4-6, Kyparissias 542 49 Thessaloniki / GR | [2002/30] |
Former [2000/24] | Vanderperre, Robert 6/8 Avenue de la Charmille 1200 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 96908939.0 | 12.04.1996 | [2000/24] | WO1996BE00042 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9738913 | Date: | 23.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007429 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007429 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D55/08 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
B65D55/0863 (EP);
B65D41/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | SCHNAPPVERSCHLUSS FÜR BIERFASS | [2000/24] | English: | SNAP-LOCKING CLOSURE DEVICE FOR A BEER BARREL | [2000/24] | French: | FERMETURE ENCLIQUETABLE POUR UN FUT A BIERE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.09.1998 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 16.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | EP05027632.8 / EP1714899 | EP05028118.7 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Request for further processing for: | 16.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 02.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.12.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 12.11.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.1999 | 30.04.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.02.2000 | 30.04.2005 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2006 | FI | 15.03.2006 | GB | 15.03.2006 | IE | 15.03.2006 | IT | 15.03.2006 | LU | 12.04.2006 | CH | 30.04.2006 | LI | 30.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | FR | 02.05.2006 | DK | 15.06.2006 | SE | 15.06.2006 | GR | 16.06.2006 | DE | 01.11.2006 | [2008/36] |
Former [2008/23] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
GB | 15.03.2006 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
FR | 02.05.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
DE | 01.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
GB | 15.03.2006 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
DE | 01.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/06] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
GB | 15.03.2006 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
DE | 01.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/16] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
GB | 15.03.2006 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
DE | 01.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0161565 (BOETZKES) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,13,16,21,22 * page 7, column 9 - page 9, column 17; figures 1-8 * [A] 9,14,24-28; | [XA]EP0652160 (LAWSON MARDON SUTTON LTD.) [X] 1-8,13,16 * column 2, line 34 - line 40; figures 1-6 * [A] 11,24-26; | [XA]EP0652162 (LAWSON MARDON SUTTON LTD.) [X] 1-8,13,16 * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 17; figures 1-3 * [A] 11,24-26; | [A]US5065883 (UDELL) [A] 22,28 * column 2, lines 59-65; figures 3,4 *; | [A]GB1242823 (GUALA & CIE) [A] 8-10,23,28 * page 2, lines 83-95; figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE9012924U (SABEU KUNSTSTOFFWERK) [A] 28 * page 7, lines 16-26; figures 1-4 * |