EP0820606 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRESENTING STEREOSCOPIC IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2000 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMAX CORPORATION 38 Isabella Street Toronto Ontario M4Y 1N1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states IMAX CORPORATION 38 Isabella Street Toronto Ontario M4Y 1N1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEAN, David, M., M. 3965 Bronte Road Oakville, Ontario L6J 4Z3 / CA | 02 /
PANABAKER, Paul, D. 1140 Bridlewood Trail Oakville, Ontario L6M 2S2 / CA | 03 /
BALJET, Anton, L. 155 Mansfield Drive Oakville, Ontario L6H 1K5 / CA | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Bibby, William Mark Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Bibby, William Mark Mathisen, Macara & co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96908963.0 | 09.04.1996 | [1998/05] | WO1996CA00221 | Priority number, date | CA19952146811 | 11.04.1995 Original published format: CA 2146811 | [1998/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9632665 | Date: | 17.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0820606 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0820606 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03B35/16, G03B35/26 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
G03B35/26 (EP,US);
G03B35/16 (EP,KR,US);
G02B30/24 (EP,US);
H04N13/341 (EP,US);
H04N13/363 (EP,US);
H04N13/337 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORFÜHRUNG STEREOSKOPISCHER BILDER | [1999/24] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRESENTING STEREOSCOPIC IMAGES | [1998/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR PRESENTER DES IMAGES STEREOSCOPIQUES | [1998/05] |
Former [1998/05] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORFÜHRUNG STEREOSKOPISCHER BILDERN | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 14.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4424529 (ROESE JOHN A [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,4,7* column 4 - column 14; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9414104 (IMAX CORP [CA]) [A] 1,3,4,6 * page 7 - page 17; figures 1-4 * |