04.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
16.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
09.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
05.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
21.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
03.10.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] |
08.08.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] |
06.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] |
21.03.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] |
11.10.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] |
02.10.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.07.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] |
19.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
19.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.02.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
18.10.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.06.2001 |
First examination report |
|
05.06.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.03.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.06.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
22.06.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.06.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
17.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.03.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] |
20.03.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] |
18.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.11.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|