Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9631666 | Global Dossier | 10.10.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2217432 | 03.10.1997 | SE9501223 | 03.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0839235 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2002 | B1 | EP0839235 | 06.05.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9600440 | 03.04.1996 | CA2217432 | 03.10.1997 | SE9501223 | 03.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2217432 | 03.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2217432 | 03.10.1997 | SE9501223 | 03.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69625065D1 | 09.01.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | SE9600440 | 03.04.1996 | SE9501223 | 03.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE507210 | 27.04.1998 | C2 | SE9501223L | 04.10.1996 | L | SE9501223D0 | 03.04.1995 | D0 | Priority number | Date | CA2217432 | 03.10.1997 | SE9501223 | 03.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE508037 | 17.08.1998 | C2 | SE9703587L | 02.10.1997 | L | SE9703587D0 | 02.10.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE9600440 | 03.04.1996 | CA2217432 | 03.10.1997 | SE9703587 | 02.10.1997 | SE9501223 | 03.04.1995 |