EP0839235 - A SHOWER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERGENWALL, Henning Aspvägen 26 B 191 41 Sollentuna / SE | [2002/48] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states BERGENWALL, Henning Aspvägen 26 B S-191 41 Sollentuna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Olsson, Jan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O.Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Olsson, Jan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB P.O.Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | ||
Former [1998/19] | Bjerkén, Jarl Hakan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB P.O.Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | Application number, filing date | 96909456.4 | 03.04.1996 | [1998/19] | WO1996SE00440 | Priority number, date | SE19950001223 | 03.04.1995 Original published format: SE 9501223 | [1998/19] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9631666 | Date: | 10.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0839235 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0839235 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/08 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
E03D9/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/19] | Title | German: | DUSCHVORRICHTUNG | [1998/19] | English: | A SHOWER DEVICE | [1998/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DOUCHE | [1998/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.1996 | Translation filed | 14.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 07.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 27.11.2002 | FR | 27.11.2002 | IT | 27.11.2002 | LI | 27.11.2002 | NL | 27.11.2002 | DK | 27.02.2003 | SE | 27.02.2003 | DE | 28.02.2003 | GB | 03.04.2003 | ES | 29.05.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/16] | CH | 27.11.2002 | |
FR | 27.11.2002 | ||
LI | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
DK | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
DE | 28.02.2003 | ||
GB | 03.04.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 27.11.2002 | |
FR | 27.11.2002 | ||
LI | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
DE | 28.02.2003 | ||
GB | 03.04.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | CH | 27.11.2002 | |
LI | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
DE | 28.02.2003 | ||
GB | 03.04.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | CH | 27.11.2002 | |
LI | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
DE | 28.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 27.11.2002 | |
LI | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
DE | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | CH | 27.11.2002 | |
LI | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 27.11.2002 | |
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 27.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2344561 ; | [Y]US4391004 ; | [Y]US3513487 ; | [Y]US3605124 ; | [A]SE399356 | [Y] - SANETT, BUSCK & CO. AB, Box 14021, 400 20 GOTEBORG 14, "Bidetillsats Som Monteras Pa Toalettstolen", Handikappmassan, Alvsjo, 22 May 1989. |