EP1017341 - BODY PART IMMOBILIZATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dean, Richard D. 21617 W. 71st Terrace Shawnee, KS 66218 / US | [2000/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEAN, Richard, D. 21617 W. 71st Terrace Shawnee, KS 66218 / US | 02 /
JONES, Dick, A. 8112 Lichtenauer Drive Shawnee, KS 66219 / US | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96909725.2 | 15.03.1996 | [2000/28] | WO1996US03594 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733541 | Date: | 18.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1017341 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.09.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
A61F5/3707 (EP);
A61B90/14 (EP);
A61B90/16 (EP);
A61B90/18 (EP);
A61N2005/1097 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2000/28] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM IMMOBILISIEREN VON KÖRPERTEILEN | [2000/28] | English: | BODY PART IMMOBILIZATION DEVICE | [2000/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMMOBILISATION DE PARTIES DU CORPS | [2000/28] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.1998 | Search fee paid | 13.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.10.1998 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 01.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/21] | 14.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4979519 (CHAVARRIA LAZARO ET AL) [X] 1-5,9-11 * abstract * * column 2, line 56 - line 58 *; | [X]US5464411 (NETHERY WINSTON J ET AL) [X] 1,6-8,12 * abstract *; | [A]FR2687918 (BEVERLY) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 5 * | International search | [X]US5370117 ; | [X]US5081665 |