EP0815481 - MAGNIFICATION CORRECTION FOR SMALL FIELD SCANNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etec Systems, Inc. 26460 Corporate Avenue Hayward, CA 94545 / US | [1998/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEN, Paul, C. 10500 South West 161st Court Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | 02 /
VOISIN, Ronald, D. 9425 S.W. 125st Street 7 Beaverton, OR 97008 / US | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [1998/02] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96910421.5 | 19.03.1996 | [1998/02] | WO1996US03299 | Priority number, date | US19950409251 | 22.03.1995 Original published format: US 409251 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9629631 | Date: | 26.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0815481 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0815481 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G02B17/08, G03F7/20 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
G02B17/0892 (EP,US);
G03F7/20 (KR);
G02B13/08 (EP,US);
G02B17/008 (EP,US);
G02B17/08 (EP,US);
G03F7/70225 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/02] | Title | German: | VERGRÖSSERUNGSKORREKTURSYSTEM FÜR DIE ABTASTUNG EINES KLEINEN FELDES | [1998/02] | English: | MAGNIFICATION CORRECTION FOR SMALL FIELD SCANNING | [1998/02] | French: | CORRECTION DE GROSSISSEMENT POUR BALAYAGE DE FAIBLE CHAMP | [1998/02] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 12.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.06.2001 | IT | 06.06.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 06.06.2001 | |
Former [2002/18] | FR | 21.12.2001 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3909834 (SANADA NORIAKI, et al) [X] 1-35 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 45 * * column 5, line 10 - column 43; figures 1,2 *; | [X]JPH0430411 ; | [A]EP0354148 (GEN SIGNAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-35 * figures 4,5; claim 1 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920513), vol. 16, no. 200, Database accession no. (E - 1201), & JP0430411 A 19920203 (CANON INC.) [X] 1-35 * abstract * | [A] - F. GOODALL ET AL., "excimer lasers as deep UV sources for photolithographic system", MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, AMSTERDAM NL, (198612), vol. 4, no. 1-4, pages 445 - 452, XP000039662 [A] 1-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-9317(86)90075-4 |