blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0851975

EP0851975 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN ACTUATOR ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1998/28]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHÖNFELDER, Dietbert
Brennerstrasse 65
D-70839 Gerlingen / DE
02 / BARBEHÖN, Kai-Lars
Hospitalstrasse 7
D-71634 Ludwigsburg / DE
03 / TAUSCHER, Joachim
Gemsenweg 41
D-70499 Stuttgart / DE
04 / DÖRR, Wolfgang
Fuchshofstrasse 11
D-71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
[1998/28]
Application number, filing date96910902.419.04.1996
[1998/28]
WO1996DE00694
Priority number, dateDE199513541923.09.1995         Original published format: DE 19535419
[1998/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9711266
Date:27.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0851975
Date:08.07.1998
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0851975
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.1997
ClassificationIPC:F02D41/30, H02P8/32
[1998/28]
CPC:
H02P8/32 (EP,US); F02D41/30 (KR); F02D41/1497 (EP,US);
F02D41/22 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/28]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINES STELLGLIEDES[1998/28]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN ACTUATOR ELEMENT[1998/28]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ACTIONNER UN ELEMENT D'AJUSTEMENT[1998/28]
Entry into regional phase23.04.1998National basic fee paid 
23.04.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
23.04.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/28]
18.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1999Fee for grant paid
04.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2092334  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,3 * page 2, line 19 - line 92 *;
 [A]DE3513791  (TELDIX GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4121547  (ASANO MASAHARU) [A] 1 * column 4, line 1 - line 57 *;
 [DA]US4476832  (FUJIMORI KYOICHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,9 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 34 * * column 7, line 13 - column 9, line 28 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.