Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4014221B | Global Dossier | 28.11.2007 | B2 | JPH11503144 | 23.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9600496 | 02.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU705471B | Global Dossier | 20.05.1999 | B2 | AU5402996 | 23.10.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9600496 | 02.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0820455 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2001 | B1 | EP0820455 | 28.01.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9600496 | 02.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE207923T | 15.11.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR9600496 | 02.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BG62970B | 29.12.2000 | B1 | BG101941 | 30.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9600496 | 02.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69616532T | 23.05.2002 | T2 | DE69616532D1 | 06.12.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9600496 | 02.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0820455T | 18.02.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9600496 | 02.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA000218 | 24.12.1998 | B1 | EA199700296 | 30.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9600496 | 02.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL126564 | 19.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | IL11775996 | 01.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9707528 | 29.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9600496 | 02.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO309480B | 05.02.2001 | B1 | NO974579L | 26.11.1997 | L | NO974579D0 | 03.10.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | FR9600496 | 02.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ305899 | 26.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9600496 | 02.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL322621 | 02.02.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9600496 | 02.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK281274B | 12.02.2001 | B6 | SK133797 | 04.03.1998 | A3 | Priority number | Date | FR9600496 | 02.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5902803 | 11.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9600496 | 02.04.1996 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6057454 | 02.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US20568998 | 04.12.1998 | US93096797 | 03.10.1997 | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9631511 | Global Dossier | 10.10.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR002983 | 27.05.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2215469 | 10.10.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1063180C | 14.03.2001 | C | CN1180357 | 29.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ285797 | 17.11.1999 | B6 | CZ314097 | 14.01.1998 | A3 | Priority number | Date | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2166441T | 16.04.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2732681 | 04.07.1997 | B1 | FR2732681 | 11.10.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP9801716 | 28.05.1999 | A3 | HUP9801716 | 30.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL117759 | 20.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR19980703550 | 05.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT820455E | 29.04.2002 | E | Priority number | Date | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW492969B | 01.07.2002 | B | Priority number | Date | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA962771 | 11.10.1996 | B | Priority number | Date | FR9504013 | 05.04.1995 |