EP0755291 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GATHERING ANALYTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUPREX CORPORATION SFC Research Center, 125 William Pitt Way Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15238 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | For all designated states SUPREX CORPORATION SFC Research Center, 125 William Pitt Way Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15238 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOUCK, Raymond, K. 832 12th Street Oakmont, PA 15139 / US | 02 /
KOEBLER, Douglas, J. 412 Old Route 30 Irwin, PA 15642 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMS, Glen, P. 213 Sycamore Ridge Drive Springdale, PA 15144 / US | 04 /
LEVY, Joseph, M. 5216 Karrington Drive Gibsonia, PA 15044 / US | 05 /
DANIELSON, Victor, G. 10 Glenshire Drive Harrison City, PA 15636 / US | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Giles, Ashley Simon, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Giles, Ashley Simon, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | ||
Former [2000/27] | Giles, Ashley Simon, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [1997/05] | Jones, Michael Raymond HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 96911195.4 | 09.02.1996 | [1997/05] | WO1996US01881 | Priority number, date | US19950388274 | 13.02.1995 Original published format: US 388274 | [1997/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9625213 | Date: | 22.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755291 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.08.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01D11/00, B01D11/02 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
G01N1/34 (EP,US);
B01D11/0203 (EP,US);
G01N2001/4061 (EP,US);
G01N2030/062 (EP,US);
G01N33/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/05] | B01D11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/05] | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR FÜR DIE POLYMERISATION VON OLEFINEN | [1997/05] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GATHERING ANALYTE | [1997/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE RECUEIL DE SUBSTANCE A ANALYSER | [1997/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 07.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 18.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 28.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/44] | 01.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3016917 (HELWIG E) [X] 1,21,24 * page 15, line 33 - page 16, line 13; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0052078 (HAUSSENER ERNST [CH]) [X] 38* example 2 *; | [A]WO9408683 (SUPREX CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,35 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4566312 (COLLINS MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [X]US4827540 (STOKES LILLIE M [US]); | [X]US5240603 (FRANK LENORE R [US], et al); | [X]US5271903 (DURST KEVIN [US], et al) |