EP0820260 - CORNEAL IMPLANT FOR CHANGING REFRACTIVE PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KERAVISION, INC. 48630 Milmont Drive Fremont California 94538-7353 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states KERAVISION, INC. 48630 Milmont Drive Fremont, California 94538-7353 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVESTRINI, Thomas, A. 1701 Las Trampas Road Alamo, CA 94507 / US | 02 /
MATHIS, Mark, L. 42770 Castillejo Court Fremont, CA 94530 / US | 03 /
SCHOLL, John, A. 14 Woodranch Circle Danville, CA 94506 / US | 04 /
PROUDFOOT, Robert, A. 3511 Tracy Drive Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96911252.3 | 04.03.1996 | [1998/05] | WO1996US03078 | Priority number, date | US19950399300 | 02.03.1995 Original published format: US 399300 | US19950437415 | 12.05.1995 Original published format: US 437415 | [1998/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9626690 | Date: | 06.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0820260 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/14 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
A61F2/147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/05] | Title | German: | HORNHAUTIMPLANTAT ZUR VERÄNDERUNG DER BRECHUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN DER HORNHAUT | [1998/05] | English: | CORNEAL IMPLANT FOR CHANGING REFRACTIVE PROPERTIES | [1998/05] | French: | IMPLANT CORNEEN DESTINE A MODIFIER LES PROPRIETES DE REFRACTION | [1998/05] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 07.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/33] | 15.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/33] | Divisional application(s) | EP00115411.1 / EP1060715 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]SU388746 (MOSCOW HELMHOLTZ EYE CLI) [X] 1-7 * figure 1 *; | [XY]WO9312735 (CHIRON INTRAOPTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 23; figure 2 * [Y] 12-16; | [YD]WO9313724 (KERAVISION INC [US]) [YD] 12-16 * page 8, line 8 - line 26 *; | [A]WO9405232 (KERAVISION INC [US], et al) [A] 8 * abstract *; | [A]WO9406504 (KERAVISION INC [US], et al) [A] 1-7* page 13, line 3 - page 14, line 18; figure 6B *; | [A]WO9503755 (KERAVISION INC [US], et al) [A] 8 * page 9, line 25 - page 10, line 2 * * page 17, line 15 - page 18, line 7; figures 3B,10-12 *; | [XP]WO9505789 (KERAVISION INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-7,12-16 * abstract * |