EP0819357 - INFORMATION TERMINAL HAVING RECONFIGURABLE MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA, INC. 5030 Sugarloaf Parkway Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC-ATLANTA, INC. 5030 Sugarloaf Parkway Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. 5030 Sugarloaf Parkway Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | ||
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC-ATLANTA, INC. One Technology Parkway South Norcross, Georgia 30092 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PINDER, Howard G. 255 Springdale Drive Atlanta, GA 30305 / US | 02 /
WASILEWSKI, Anthony J. 10680 Wren Ridge Road Alpharetta, GA 30202 / US | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 96911437.0 | 02.04.1996 | [1998/04] | WO1996US04165 | Priority number, date | US19950415617 | 03.04.1995 Original published format: US 415617 | [1998/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9631982 | Date: | 10.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0819357 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819357 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.10.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/167 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/062 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04N21/2351 (EP,US);
H04N21/25875 (EP,US);
H04N21/26613 (EP,US);
H04N21/2665 (EP,US);
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
H04N21/4182 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/4353 (EP,US);
H04N21/4623 (EP,US);
H04N21/63345 (EP,US);
H04N21/6543 (EP,US);
H04N21/6582 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1998/04] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSSENDGERÄT MIT REKONFIGURIERBAREM SPEICHER | [1998/04] | English: | INFORMATION TERMINAL HAVING RECONFIGURABLE MEMORY | [1998/04] | French: | TERMINAL D'INFORMATION A MEMOIRE RECONFIGURABLE | [1998/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.1997 | Search fee paid | 20.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 29.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2007 | 31.10.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.05.2008 | [2010/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4623920 (DUFRESNE MICHEL [CA], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8 * column 1, line 50 - line 68 * * column 3, line 20 - line 54 * * column 7, line 38 - column 8, line 33 * * column 9, line 10 - line 27 * * figure 3 * * claims 1-10,16,18 * [Y] 2,3,6,9,12,14,15,21; | [XY]US5367571 (BOWEN DONALD H [US], et al) [X] 17 * column 1, line 19 - line 23 * * column 7, line 37 - line 50 * * column 9, line 59 - line 61 * * column 10, line 41 - line 47 * * figures 2A,2B,3A,3B,3C,3D,4,5,6,7 * * claims 1,2 * [Y] 2,3,12; | [Y]EP0586022 (FISCHER ADDISON M [US]) [Y] 6,9,14,15,21 * page 2, line 10 - page 6, line 51 * | International search | [A]US5231665 (AULD FREDERICK H [US], et al); | [A]US5270822 (CHOI SEUNG L [KR]); | [A]US5400401 (WASILEWSKI ANTHONY J [US], et al) |