EP0824697 - ONE STEP IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHIC DEVICE AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyntek Diagnostics, Inc. Suite 101, 6146 Nancy Ridge Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [1998/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Ching 635 Indigo Canyon Road Chula Vista, CA 91911 / US | 02 /
FAN, Eugene 7813 Esterel Drive La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96911611.0 | 04.04.1996 | [1998/09] | WO1996US04748 | Priority number, date | US19950444238 | 18.04.1995 Original published format: US 444238 | [1998/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9633413 | Date: | 24.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0824697 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0824697 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.10.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/558, G01N33/76 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
Y10S435/805 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US);
Y10S435/967 (EP,US);
Y10S435/97 (EP,US);
Y10S435/971 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/09] | G01N33/543 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/09] | Title | German: | EINSTUFIGE IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [1998/09] | English: | ONE STEP IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHIC DEVICE AND METHOD OF USE | [1998/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHIE A UNE PHASE ET SON UTILISATION | [1998/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1997 | Search fee paid | 17.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 19.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.09.2002 | FI | 04.09.2002 | GR | 04.09.2002 | DK | 04.12.2002 | PT | 13.12.2002 | LU | 04.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | [2007/16] |
Former [2005/21] | BE | 04.09.2002 | |
FI | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
LU | 04.04.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | BE | 04.09.2002 | |
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
LU | 04.04.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | BE | 04.09.2002 | |
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
LU | 04.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | BE | 04.09.2002 | |
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 04.09.2002 | |
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 04.09.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4235601 (DEUTSCH MARSHALL E [US], et al) [DA] 1-15 * column W *; | [A]EP0284232 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]EP0383619 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9201226 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO8808534 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [X]US5354692 (YANG HSIN M [US], et al); | [XP]US5384264 (CHEN TED M [US], et al) |