EP0833830 - HYDROXY FUNCTIONAL ALKOXYSILANE AND ALKOXYSILANE FUNCTIONAL POLYURETHANE MADE THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOREN, Dean, M. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
OWEN, Ian, R. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96911810.8 | 19.04.1996 | [1998/15] | WO1996US05433 | Priority number, date | US19950460349 | 02.06.1995 Original published format: US 460349 | [1998/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9638453 | Date: | 05.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0833830 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0833830 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/18, C08G83/00, C08G71/04 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
C07F7/18 (KR);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G71/04 (KR);
C08G83/00 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/289 (EP,US);
C08G18/12, C08G18/289 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/15] | Title | German: | HYDROXYFUNKTIONELLE ALKOXYSILANE UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE ALKOXYSILANFUNKTIONELLE POLYURETHANE | [1998/18] | English: | HYDROXY FUNCTIONAL ALKOXYSILANE AND ALKOXYSILANE FUNCTIONAL POLYURETHANE MADE THEREFROM | [1998/15] | French: | ALCOXYSILANE AYANT DES FONCTIONS HYDROXY ET POLYURETHANE A FONCTIONS ALCOXYSILANE FABRIQUE A PARTIR DE CET ALCOXYSILANE | [1998/15] |
Former [1998/15] | HYDROXYFUNKTIONELLE ALKOXYSILANE UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE ALKOXYSILANFUNKTIONNELLE POLYURETHANE | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.11.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 20.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.03.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 30.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 03.03.1999 | IT | 03.03.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/27] | ES | 03.03.1999 | Cited in | International search | SU295764 [ ] (IRKUTSK INSTITUTE OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY) | [X] - CAPLUS, Database accession no. 1971:449205, XP002004952 | [ ] - ZHURNAL OBSCHEI KHIMII, (1971), vol. 41, no. 4, page 933 | [X] - VAKHRUSHEV, L.P. ET AL., "SILICON CONTAINING CARBAMATES", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19710816), vol. 75, no. 7, Database accession no. 49321t, XP002004953 [X] 1-6 * abstract * |