EP0832071 - 1,3-DIHYDRO-2H-IMIDAZOL-2-ONE DERIVATIVES HAVING PDE IV AND CYTOKININ INHIBITING ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREYNE, Eddy, Jean, Edgard Jan Van Eycklei 8 B-2840 Rumst / BE | 02 /
DIELS, Gaston, Stanislas, Marcella Oosteinde 12 B-2380 Ravels / BE | 03 /
ANDRES-GIL, José, Ignacio Vesubiana, 22, Getafe-Sector 3 E-28905 Madrid / ES | 04 /
FERNANDEZ-GADEA, Francisco, Javier Sagra, 20, Cerro de las Perdices, Bargas E-45593 Toledo / ES | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Quaghebeur, Luc Johnson & Johnson Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Quaghebeur, Luc Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Patent Department, Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Application number, filing date | 96911969.2 | 28.03.1996 | [1998/14] | WO1996EP01393 | Priority number, date | EP19950200870 | 06.04.1995 Original published format: EP 95200870 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9631487 | Date: | 10.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0832071 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832071 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/70, C07D233/32, C07D405/04, A61K31/415 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
C07D405/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D233/70 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/415 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D233/32 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/14] | Title | German: | 1,3-DIHYDRO-2H-IMIDAZOL-2-ON-DERIVATE MIT PDEIV UND CYTOKIN INHIBIERENDER AKTIVITÄT | [1998/14] | English: | 1,3-DIHYDRO-2H-IMIDAZOL-2-ONE DERIVATIVES HAVING PDE IV AND CYTOKININ INHIBITING ACTIVITY | [1998/14] | French: | DERIVES 1,3-DIHYDRO-2H-IMIDAZOL-2-ONE AYANT DES PROPRIETES D'INHIBITION DE LA PDE IV ET DE LA CYTOKININE | [1998/14] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 26.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 28.09.2005 | DK | 28.12.2005 | GR | 28.12.2005 | SE | 28.12.2005 | PT | 28.02.2006 | [2006/35] |
Former [2006/25] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/15] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
SE | 28.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9402465 (RHONE POULENC RORER LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,12-17 * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 27 *; | [X]WO9504045 (RHONE POULENC RORER LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,12-17 * page 9, line 10 - page 10, line 16 *; | [PX]WO9520578 (RHONE POULENC RORER LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1,12-17 * page 7, line 1 - line 29 *; | [PX]WO9600218 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [PX] 1,12-16 * page 49 - page 50; claim 1 * * page 9, line 1 - line 10 * * page 8, line 13 - line 22 *; | [PX]WO9600215 (CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]) [PX] 1,12-16 * page 35; claim 1 * * page 14, line 15 - line 17 ** page 15, line 15 - line 19 * |