EP0823018 - FUEL INJECTION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ficht GmbH & Co. KG Spannleitenberg 1 85614 Kirchseeon / DE | [1999/24] |
Former [1998/07] | For all designated states FICHT GmbH Spannleitenberg 1 D-85614 Kirchseeon / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIMBERG, Wolfgang Böhmerwaldstrasse 72 D-85560 Ebersberg / DE | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Solf, Alexander, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Solf, Alexander, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96912032.8 | 23.04.1996 | [1998/07] | WO1996EP01695 | Priority number, date | DE1995115774 | 28.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19515774 | DE1995115781 | 28.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19515781 | [1998/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9634195 | Date: | 31.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0823018 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823018 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/04, F02M63/06, F02B17/00, F02M45/06 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
F04B17/042 (EP,US);
F02M51/04 (EP,KR,US);
F02B17/005 (EP,US);
F02M45/06 (EP,US);
F02M59/462 (EP,US);
F02M63/06 (EP,KR,US);
F02M69/045 (EP,US);
F01B9/023 (EP,US);
F02B2075/125 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/07] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFF-EINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN | [1998/07] | English: | FUEL INJECTION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES | [1998/07] | French: | INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1998/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 29.10.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 16.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.03.2000 | AT | 23.04.2000 | [2002/27] |
Former [2002/10] | AT | 23.04.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE415182 (AUGUST NAGEL DR); | [A]FR2452608 (PIERBURG GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]US5351893 (YOUNG NIELS O [US]) [A] 1,3,5,13 * column 8, line 4 - column 9, line 59; figures 1-6 * |