EP0848598 - SYSTEM OF LAPAROSCOPIC-ENDOSCOPIC SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giannadakis, Emmanuil 4-6 Makrinitsis Street 115 22 Athens / GR | [1998/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/26] | Application number, filing date | 96912169.8 | 10.05.1996 | [1998/26] | WO1996GR00012 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9742889 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848598 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0848598 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61B17/28 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B17/3417 (EP,US);
A61B17/3439 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00362 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/26] | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR DIE LAPAROSKOPISCHE UND ENDOSKOPISCHE CHIRURGIE | [1998/26] | English: | SYSTEM OF LAPAROSCOPIC-ENDOSCOPIC SURGERY | [1998/26] | French: | SYSTEME POUR LA CHIRURGIE ENDOSCOPIQUE ET LAPAROSCOPIQUE | [1998/26] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 13.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.1998 | 31.05.2003 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.02.2005 | IT | 23.02.2005 | GB | 23.05.2005 | DE | 24.05.2005 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/35] | FR | 23.02.2005 | |
GB | 23.05.2005 | ||
DE | 24.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | FR | 23.02.2005 | |
DE | 24.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/18] | DE | 24.05.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9300946 (ENDOMEDIX CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 34 - page 10, line 14 *; | [A]EP0646358 (PACESETTER AB [SE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 5 *; | [A]US3789852 (KIM S, et al) |