blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0856165

EP0856165 - ARTICLE AND METHOD FOR COOLING A SHEET OF MATERIAL WHILE MINIMIZING WRINKLING AND CURLING WITHIN THE SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/32]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KIRKWOLD, John, O.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
02 / MUNTIFERING, Roger, H.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
03 / SORENSEN, Steven, W.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
04 / GOTICH, Thomas, F.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
05 / BIEGLER, Robert, M.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[1998/32]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1998/32]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date96912615.010.04.1996
[1998/32]
WO1996US04791
Priority number, dateUS1995054029006.10.1995         Original published format: US 540290
[1998/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9720253
Date:05.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0856165
Date:05.08.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0856165
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.06.1997
ClassificationIPC:G03D13/00
[1998/32]
CPC:
G03D13/002 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1998/32]
TitleGerman:GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABKÜHLUNG VON BLATTMATERIAL UNTER MINIMISIERUNG DES AUFROLLENS UND DER FALTENBILDUNG IM BLATTMATERIAL[2000/02]
English:ARTICLE AND METHOD FOR COOLING A SHEET OF MATERIAL WHILE MINIMIZING WRINKLING AND CURLING WITHIN THE SHEET[1998/32]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR REFROIDIR UNE FEUILLE D'UN MATERIAU, ET MINIMISER SIMULTANEMENT LE PLISSEMENT ET LE ROULAGE DANS CETTE FEUILLE[1998/32]
Former [1998/32]GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABKÜHLUNG VON BLATTMATERIAL UNTER MINIM ISIERUNG DES AUFROLLENS UND DER FALTENBILDUNG IM BLATTMATERIAL
Entry into regional phase15.04.1998National basic fee paid 
15.04.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.04.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/32]
15.04.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
12.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.1998Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
12.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
25.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
16.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.1999Fee for grant paid
26.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
IT12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2003/09]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
Former [2001/08]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS6461752  ;
 [A]JPH03208048  ;
 [A]JPS58211152  ;
 [A]GB2037005  (HELL R GMBH) [A] 1,6,8,10 * abstract *;
 [A]US4485294  (ROSENBERG DAVID B [US]) [A] 1,6,8,10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890621), vol. 13, no. 269, Database accession no. (P - 888), & JP01061752 A 19890308 (FUJI PHOTO FILM) [A] 1,8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911205), vol. 15, no. 480, Database accession no. (P - 1284), & JP03208048 A 19910911 (CANON) [A] 1,8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840322), vol. 8, no. 60, Database accession no. (P - 262), & JP58211152 A 19831208 (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO) [A] 1,8 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.