EP0820558 - OVERSPEED GOVERNOR CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUTKA, Martin, J. 3110 Royal Huntsmans Court South Bend, IN 46637 / US | 02 /
POELSTRA, Rick, L. 51841 Hedge Lane Granger, IN 46530 / US | 03 /
WIEGAND, Timothy, F. 51041 Grapevine Court South Bend, IN 46628 / US | 04 /
FUTA, Paul, W., Jr. 28550 State Road 23 North Liberty, IN 46554 / US | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96912691.1 | 10.04.1996 | [1998/05] | WO1996US05012 | Priority number, date | US19950419338 | 10.04.1995 Original published format: US 419338 | [1998/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9632577 | Date: | 17.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0820558 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0820558 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F02C9/28, F02C9/38 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
F02C9/28 (EP,US);
F02C9/38 (EP,US);
F05D2270/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/05] | Title | German: | ÜBERDREHZAHLREGELUNG UND REGELSYSTEM FÜR GASTURBINEN | [1998/05] | English: | OVERSPEED GOVERNOR CONTROL SYSTEM | [1998/05] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE A REGULATEUR DE SURREGIME | [1998/05] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0278833 (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4602479 (HANSEN KENNETH P [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4716723 (RALSTON RUSSELL B [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2092677 (ROLLS ROYCE) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2197909 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4760662 (DYER GERALD P [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4245462 (MCCOMBS JR HOWARD L) [DA] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4837697 (EISA SORAYA [US], et al) [DA] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US3049139 (THOMPSON THOMAS J, et al) |