EP0822938 - ENHANCED SYNTHESIS OF RACEMIC METALLOCENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBEMARLE CORPORATION 451 Florida Street Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1765 / US | [1999/24] |
Former [1998/07] | For all designated states ALBEMARLE CORPORATION 451 Florida Street Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1780 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRICKLER, Jamie, R. 4111 Country Hill Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US | 02 /
POWER, John, M. 635 Mossy Oak Avenue Baton Rouge, LA 70810 / US | 03 /
LIN, Ronny, W. 2823 Galahad Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US | 04 /
DESOTO, Troy, E. 5103 Nicholson Drive A17 Baton Rouge, LA 70820 / US | 05 /
BALHOFF, John, F. 2816 Dakin Avenue Baton Rouge, LA 70820 / US | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Sandmair, Kurt Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Sandmair, Kurt, Dr. Dr. Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96912721.6 | 12.04.1996 | [1998/07] | WO1996US05089 | Priority number, date | US19950427505 | 24.04.1995 Original published format: US 427505 | [1998/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9634002 | Date: | 31.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0822938 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0822938 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07F17/00 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
Y10S526/943 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/07] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE SYNTHESE VON RACEMISCHEN METALLOCENEN | [1998/07] | English: | ENHANCED SYNTHESIS OF RACEMIC METALLOCENES | [1998/07] | French: | SYNTHESE AMELIOREE DE METALLOCENES RACEMIQUES | [1998/07] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 27.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5302733 (DIEFENBACH STEVEN P [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]CH646438 (LONZA AG [CH]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0423101 (FINA TECHNOLOGY [US]) [DA] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0485823 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [DA] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A] - BROUSSIER R ET AL, "[1]Ferrocenophanes containing a Group 4 transition metal in the bridge. X-ray structure of one representative", INORG. CHEM. (INOCAJ,00201669);90; VOL.29 (10); PP.1817-22, FAC. SCI.;LAB. SYNTH. ELECTROSYNTH. ORGANOMET.; DIJON; 21000; FR. (FR), XP000573538 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic00335a011 |