EP0823052 - A MULTICAPILLARY FLUORESCENT DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 4300 N Harbor Boulevard, PO Box 3100 Fullerton, CA 92834-3100 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 4300 N Harbor Boulevard, PO Box 3100 Fullerton, CA 92834-3100 / US | ||
Former [1998/07] | For all designated states BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS, INC. 2500 Harbor Boulevard Fullerton, CA 92634 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENTONEY, Stephen L. Jr. 1979 Paseo Grande Chino Hills, CA 91709 / US | 02 /
RAKESTRAW, David J. 521 Chardonnay Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [2005/37] |
Former [1998/07] | 01 /
PENTONEY, Stephen L. Jr. 5126 Lakeview Yorba Linda, CA 92686 / US | ||
02 /
RAKESTRAW, David J. 521 Chardonnay Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | Representative(s) | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks 1 Blythswood Square Glasgow G2 4AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96913233.1 | 26.04.1996 | [1998/07] | WO1996US05903 | Priority number, date | US19950429406 | 26.04.1995 Original published format: US 429406 | [1998/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9634278 | Date: | 31.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0823052 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823052 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/447 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
G01N27/44721 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/07] | Title | German: | VIELFACHKAPILLARFLUORESZENZSENSORANORDNUNG | [1998/07] | English: | A MULTICAPILLARY FLUORESCENT DETECTION SYSTEM | [1998/07] | French: | SYSTEME DE DETECTION FLUORESCENT A CAPILLAIRES MULTIPLES | [1998/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 14.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5246866 (NASU HISANORI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 2; figure 1 *; | [DY]US5274240 (MATHIES RICHARD A [US], et al) [DY] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0504943 (HITACHI SOFTWARE ENG [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]WO9403631 (BIOMETRIC IMAGING INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure 10 *; | [A]US5290419 (KAMBARA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0539743 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2558262 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]) [A] 1 * figure 6 * |