EP0826266 - ELECTRIC MOTOR DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIENERT, Wolfgang Rednitzstrasse 48 D-90449 Nürnberg / DE | [1998/10] | Application number, filing date | 96913458.4 | 02.05.1996 | [1998/10] | WO1996DE00765 | Priority number, date | DE1995117989 | 16.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19517989 | [1998/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9637035 | Date: | 21.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0826266 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0826266 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02K9/06, F04D25/02 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
H02K9/06 (EP,KR);
F04D25/026 (EP);
H02K2213/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, LI, SE [1998/10] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTORISCHER ANTRIEB | [1998/10] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR DRIVE | [1998/10] | French: | SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT ASSURE PAR MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [1998/10] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 09.12.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4239095 (DE JONG ALLEN W [CA]) [Y] 1,2 * column 1, line 58 - column 4, line 29; figures 1-3 * [A] 3,4,7,8; | [Y]EP0050771 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2* page 4, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 3; figures 4,7,8 * | Examination | FR2506536 |