EP0827528 - NEUTRALIZATION OF TALL OIL SOAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AITTA, Eero Lottakuja FIN-91410 Jokirinne / FI | 02 /
VARILA, Elias Kerrostie 8 B FIN-90940 Jääli / FI | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A., Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96913540.9 | 03.05.1996 | [1998/11] | WO1996FI00243 | Priority number, date | FI19950002176 | 05.05.1995 Original published format: FI 952176 | [1998/11] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9634932 | Date: | 07.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0827528 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0827528 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0827528 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C11B13/02, C09F1/00 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
C11B13/02 (EP,US);
Y02W30/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, PT, SE [1998/11] | Title | German: | DIE NEUTRALISIERUNG VON TALLÖLSEIFEN | [1998/11] | English: | NEUTRALIZATION OF TALL OIL SOAP | [1998/11] | French: | NEUTRALISATION DE SAVON DE TALLOL | [1998/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.1996 | Translation filed | 04.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 06.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 27.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.2000
ADMISSIBLE AGA AB 18181 Lidingö / SE Opponent's representative Hjelt, Pia Dorrit Helene, et al, et al Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.2000
ADMISSIBLE AGA AB 18181 Lidingö / SE Opponent's representative Hjelt, Pia Dorrit Helene, et al, et al Borenius & Co Oy Ab, Kansakoulukuja 3 00100 Helsinki / FI | 04.05.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.01.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.12.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.12.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.05.2003 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.05.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.12.2003 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.05.2002 | [2003/48] | Cited in | International search | [A]SE98166 ; | [A]US3901869 (BILLS ALAN M); | [AP]WO9523837 (METSAE BOTNIA AB OY [FI], et al) | Examination | US4075188 | WO9411571 | - "Crude spent sulphite liquor as soap acidulation additives to improve efficiency of tall oil production"V.C. Uloth, et al;pp.T124-T126 | Opposition | - Pulp & Paper Canada, Vol. 85, No. 5, pp. T124-T126, 1984 |