EP0879109 - TOOL FOR CUTTING MACHINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seco Tools AB 737 82 Fagersta / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states SECO TOOLS AB S-737 82 Fagersta / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARLSSON, Ronny Ekbacken, Vangsten S-615 31 Valdemarsvik / SE | 02 /
Bruhn, Johnny Spjutbostigen 6 S-738 32 Norberg / SE | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel, et al Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Taquist, Lennart, et al Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE | Application number, filing date | 96913765.2 | 03.05.1996 | [1998/48] | WO1996SE00581 | Priority number, date | SE19950001687 | 04.05.1995 Original published format: SE 9501687 | [1998/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9634714 | Date: | 07.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0879109 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0879109 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/00 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
B23B31/1075 (EP,US);
B23B51/00 (KR);
B23B31/008 (EP,US);
B23B31/11 (EP,US);
B23B51/02 (EP,US);
B23B51/0486 (EP,US);
B23P15/32 (EP,US);
B23B2222/28 (EP,US);
B23B2251/02 (EP,US);
B23B2260/132 (EP,US);
Y10S408/713 (EP,US);
Y10T408/9097 (EP,US);
Y10T408/90993 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/48] | Title | German: | WERKZEUG FÜR SCHNEIDMASCHINE | [1998/48] | English: | TOOL FOR CUTTING MACHINING | [1998/48] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE | [1998/48] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 11.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01121534.0 / EP1163966 | EP03003821.0 / EP1325787 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 10.12.2003 | [2004/16] | Cited in | International search | [A]SU1756033 ; | [X]DE1950718 (DIAGRIT GRINDING COMPANY LTD); | [X]EP0175011 (KUEHN PRAEZISIONSWERKZEUG [DE]); | [A]US4684298 (ROOS AAGE V [SE]); | [X]EP0358901 (HERTEL AG [DE]); | [A]DE3831352 (HERTEL AG WERKZEUGE HARTSTOFF [DE]) | [A] - DERWENT'S ABSTRACT, No. 93-310051/39, week 9339; & SU,A,1 756 033 (ODESS POLY), 23 August 1992., & SU1756033 A 00000000 |