blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0826012

EP0826012 - BIODEGRADABLE ALKYLENE OXIDE-LACTONE COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 15.12.2004  [2004/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
[1998/10]
Inventor(s)01 / NACE, Vaughn, Mark
222 Huckleberry Drive
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US
[1998/10]
Representative(s)Raynor, John
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London
WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/10]Raynor, John
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date96913828.823.04.1996
[1998/10]
WO1996US05672
Priority number, dateUS1995044411718.05.1995         Original published format: US 444117
[1998/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9636656
Date:21.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0826012
Date:04.03.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0826012
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.11.1996
ClassificationIPC:C08G63/664
[1998/10]
CPC:
C08G63/664 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/10]
TitleGerman:BIOABBAUBARE ALKYLENOXYD-LAKTON COPOLYMER[1998/10]
English:BIODEGRADABLE ALKYLENE OXIDE-LACTONE COPOLYMERS[1998/10]
French:COPOLYMERES BIODEGRADABLES D'OXYDE D'ALKYLENE ET DE LACTONE[1998/10]
Entry into regional phase17.12.1997National basic fee paid 
17.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.12.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/10]
05.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
15.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.08.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2000Fee for grant paid
28.09.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
09.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipPT16.08.2001
GR17.08.2001
[2004/51]
Former [2002/27]PT16.08.2001
Cited inInternational search[DX]US2962524  (FRITZ HOSTETTLER ET AL.) [DX] 1-12,15-20 * column 1, lines 15-20; examples 8-18,22-24; claims 1-23 *;
 [X]GB2016491  (UGINE KUHLMANN) [X] 1-14 * claims 1-10 *;
 [D]US4291155  (BROCHET JACQUES)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.