EP0824612 - ROTARY LOOP TAKER WITH REPLACEABLE TIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BADILLO, Paul 7644 Dawn Drive Littleton, CO 80125 / US | [1998/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Wablat, Wolfgang Patentanwalt Dr. Dr. W. Wablat Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | Wablat, Wolfgang, Dr.Dr. Patentanwalt, Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 96913842.9 | 25.04.1996 | [1998/09] | WO1996US05795 | Priority number, date | US19950429698 | 27.04.1995 Original published format: US 429698 | [1998/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9634137 | Date: | 31.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0824612 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0824612 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D05B57/14 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
D05B57/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1998/09] | Title | German: | UMLAUFENDER SCHLINGENFÄNGER MIT AUSWECHSELBARER SPITZE | [1998/09] | English: | ROTARY LOOP TAKER WITH REPLACEABLE TIP | [1998/09] | French: | ELEMENT ROTATIF D'ENROULEMENT DE BOUCLE A EXTREMITE REMPLACABLE | [2001/12] |
Former [1998/09] | ELEMENT ROTATIF D'ENROULEMENT DE BOUCLE A EXTREMITE REMPLA ABLE | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.1997 | Search fee paid | 30.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 14.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE933601 (THIERMANN KARL) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,18,19,22,23 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4966088 (BADILLO PAUL [US]); | [Y]US1431380 (CARSON DICKSON KIT); | [Y]US3139050 (GRABOWSKI CHARLES M); | [Y]US4493278 (BADILLO PAUL [US]); | [AP]US5427042 (YAMASAKI HIROSHI [JP]); | [AP]US5474004 (BADILLO PAUL [US]) |