Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0872009
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.03.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 10.05.2000 [2000/19] |
07.12.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
19.08.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.06.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.04.1999 |
First examination report |
|
26.04.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.09.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] |
04.09.1998 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] |
04.09.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] |
02.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.06.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|