EP0872009 - ONE-PIECE MAGNET RETURN PATH ASSEMBLY FOR A DISK DRIVE ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2000 [2000/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IOMEGA CORPORATION 1821 West 4000 South, Bldg. 1 Ogden Utah 84067 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states IOMEGA CORPORATION 1821 West 4000 South, Bldg. 1 Ogden Utah 84067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRACKEN, Allen, Thomas 1490 E. Kayscreek Drive Layton, UT 84040 / US | 02 /
RICH, Edward, L. 5173 Old Post Road Ogden, UT 84403 / US | 03 /
DAVIS, Ted, R. 6313 South Santa Fe Oklahoma City, OK 73139 / US | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 96913925.2 | 03.05.1996 | [1998/43] | WO1996US06237 | Priority number, date | US19950450691 | 25.05.1995 Original published format: US 450691 | [1998/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637945 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0872009 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.11.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02K41/02, H02K15/14, H02K1/17, H02K41/035 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
H02K41/0358 (EP,US);
H02K15/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [1998/43] | Title | German: | EINTEILIGE MAGNETRÜCKSCHLUSSANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN PLATTENANTRIEB | [1998/43] | English: | ONE-PIECE MAGNET RETURN PATH ASSEMBLY FOR A DISK DRIVE ACTUATOR | [1998/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF FAIT D'UNE PIECE, DESTINE A CANALISER LE FLUX DE RETOUR D'UN AIMANT D'UN SYSTEME D'ACTIONNEMENT D'UN LECTEUR DE DISQUES | [1998/43] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 29.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 29.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/19] | 09.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9409490 (MAXTOR CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 4; figure 4 *; | [X]US4985793 (ANDERSON KURT M [US]) [X] 1-10 * figure 6 *; | [X]EP0618664 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 35; figure 2 *; | [A]US4775908 (YCAS JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6,7 * figure 5 * | International search | [A]US5313124 (MACPHERSON AARON S [US]); | [A]US4443775 (FUJITANI HIDETSUGU [JP], et al) |