EP0846068 - PLASTICS COVERING FOR VEHICLE WITH AIRBAGS AND METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SAID COVERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PEGUFORM GMBH Schlossmattenstrasse 18 79268 Bötzingen / DE | [1999/19] |
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states PEGUFORM-WERKE GMBH Schlossmattenstrasse 18 79268 Bötzingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANNBÖKE, Eckhard Schlesierstrasse 12 D-79346 Endingen / DE | 02 /
GRÜNER, Engelbert Oberer Bichlweg 4 D-92339 Beilngries / DE | 03 /
HÄRRINGER, Erwin Adlergasse 17 D-79369 Wyhl / DE | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | RACKETTE Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 13 10 79013 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | RACKETTE Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Postfach 13 10 79013 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96914051.6 | 09.05.1996 | [1998/24] | WO1996DE00785 | Priority number, date | DE1995211172U | 14.07.1995 Original published format: DE 29511172 U | [1998/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9703866 | Date: | 06.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0846068 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0846068 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
B60R21/216 (EP);
B60K37/20 (EP);
B60R21/2165 (EP);
B60K35/10 (EP);
B60R2021/21537 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI [1998/24] | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFVERKLEIDUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGE MIT LUFTSACK UND VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1998/24] | English: | PLASTICS COVERING FOR VEHICLE WITH AIRBAGS AND METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SAID COVERING | [1998/24] | French: | HABILLAGE EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE POUR VEHICULE EQUIPE DE COUSSINS GONFLABLES, AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION | [1998/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.03.1998 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   27.03.1998 | 26.03.1998 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   27.03.1998 | 26.03.1998 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   27.03.1998 | 26.03.1998 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   27.03.1998 | 26.03.1998 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   27.03.1998 | 26.03.1998 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   27.03.1998 | 26.03.1998 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   27.03.1998 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.03.1998 | M01   Fee paid on   27.03.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.05.2000 | LI | 31.05.2000 | [2002/02] | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0299324 ; | [A]JPH02171362 ; | [A]JPH0490942 ; | [A]JPH06285876 ; | [A]JPH04151345 ; | [A]EP0363986 (TIP ENG GROUP INC [US]); | [A]GB2244239 (TAKATA CORP [JP]); | [A]FR2662409 (TAKATA CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0465869 (DAVIDSON TEXTRON INC [US]); | [A]EP0495188 (DAVIDSON TEXTRON INC [US]) |