EP0778921 - PUMPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1997/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIMMER, Erwin Scheffelweg 9 D-73655 Plüderhausen / DE | 02 /
DENZ, Helmut Lindenspürstrasse 18 D-70176 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
SCHULZ, Wolfgang Schubartstrasse 129 D-74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 04 /
WILD, Ernst Wernerstrasse 20/6 D-71739 Oberriexingen / DE | 05 /
KUHNT, Winfried Zeppelinstrasse 26 D-70193 Stuttgart / DE | 06 /
SCHWEGLER, Helmut Max-Eyth-Strasse 15 D-74385 Pleidelsheim / DE | 07 /
BLUMENSTOCK, Andreas Jägerhofallee 79 D-71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | 08 /
MIEHLE, Tilman Friedrichstrasse 20 D-71394 Kernen / DE | 09 /
ZIMMERMANN, Manfred Salinenstrasse 3 D-74906 Bad Rappenau / DE | [1997/25] | Application number, filing date | 96914066.4 | 10.05.1996 | [1997/25] | WO1996DE00815 | Priority number, date | DE1995123935 | 30.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19523935 | [1997/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9702421 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0778921 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0778921 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/08, F04B45/047, F04B49/24 | [1997/25] | CPC: |
C07K14/4703 (EP,US);
F02M37/046 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
F01D25/285 (EP,US);
F02M25/0818 (EP,US);
F02M37/44 (KR);
F04B43/04 (EP,US);
F04B43/14 (KR);
F04B45/047 (EP,US);
F04B45/10 (KR);
F04B49/24 (EP,KR,US);
F23R3/60 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
B23P2700/13 (EP,US);
F02M2037/085 (KR);
F02M2700/1347 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/25] | Title | German: | PUMPVORRICHTUNG | [1997/25] | English: | PUMPING DEVICE | [1997/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POMPAGE | [1997/25] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 19.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.04.2001 | GB | 04.04.2001 | IT | 04.04.2001 | ES | 30.10.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/35] | FR | 04.04.2001 | |
GB | 04.04.2001 | ||
ES | 30.10.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | GB | 04.04.2001 | |
FR | 31.08.2001 | ||
ES | 30.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/17] | GB | 04.04.2001 | |
FR | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | GB | 04.04.2001 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9415090 (SIEMENS ELECTRIC LTD [CA]) [AD] 1-8,13 * abstract * * page 13, line 14 - page 15, line 12; figures 3-5 *; | [A]WO9427131 (CHRYSLER CORP [US]) [A] 1-8,13 * abstract * * page 4, line 10 - page 6, line 20; figure 1 * |