EP0834155 - METHOD OF DISPENSING SMART CARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Angewandte Digital Elektronik GmbH Ecksweg 4 21521 Dassendorf / DE | [1998/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KREFT, Hans-Dietrich Ecksweg 4 D-21521 Dassendorf / DE | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Mierswa, Klaus, et al Iridium IP Friedrich-König-Strasse 3-5 68167 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Mierswa, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Friedrichstrasse 171 68199 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 96914086.2 | 18.05.1996 | [1998/15] | WO1996DE00870 | Priority number, date | DE1995117818 | 18.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19517818 | [1998/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9636936 | Date: | 21.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0834155 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0834155 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06K17/00 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06K19/00 (KR);
G06K17/00 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/355 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1998/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSGABE VON CHIPKARTEN | [1998/15] | English: | METHOD OF DISPENSING SMART CARDS | [1998/15] | French: | PROCEDE DE DISTRIBUTION DE CARTES A PUCE | [1998/15] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 05.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 10.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 02.05.2001 | AT | 18.05.2001 | CH | 17.06.2001 | LI | 17.06.2001 | SE | 02.08.2001 | ES | 30.11.2001 | [2015/21] |
Former [2004/04] | NL | 02.05.2001 | |
AT | 18.05.2001 | ||
SE | 02.08.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 02.05.2001 | |
AT | 18.05.2001 | ||
SE | 02.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 02.08.2001 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0266926 (THORN EMI MALCO INC [US]) [Y] 6,7,9 * column 1, line 1 - line 10; figures 1,2,4,5 * * column 1, line 30 - line 37 * * column 2, line 19 - line 27 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 11 * * column 4, line 49 - line 51 * * column 5, line 28 - line 33 * * column 6, line 8 - line 12 * * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 9 *; | [XY]WO9304433 (DATACARD CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,8,10 * page 1, line 12 - line 14 * * page 1, line 19 - line 20 * * page 1, line 31 - line 37 * * page 4, line 4 - line 24 * * page 10, line 13 - line 18 * * page 11, line 8 - line 27 * * page 11, line 34 - line 36 * [Y] 6,7,9,11; | [Y]WO9415306 (DATACARD CORP [US]) [Y] 11 * page 1, line 32 - line 35 ** page 3, line 24 - line 31 * |