EP0825932 - SEAL FOR A SIDE WINDOW OF AN AUTOMOBILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMI DODUCO GmbH Im Altgefäll 12 75181 Pforzheim / DE | [1999/11] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states DODUCO GmbH Im Altgefäll 12 75181 Pforzheim / DE | ||
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states DODUCO GMBH + Co Dr. Eugen Dürrwächter Im Altgefäll 12 75172 Pforzheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZE, Gunter, Lothar Lutherstrasse 3 D-75228 Ispringen / DE | 02 /
NORMANN, Norbert Panoramastrasse 12 D-75223 Niefern-Öschelbronn / DE | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Twelmeier, Ulrich, et al Zerrennerstrasse 23-25 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [2009/30] |
Former [1998/10] | Twelmeier, Ulrich, Dipl. Phys., et al Patentanwalt, Zerrennerstrasse 23-25 75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 96914204.1 | 13.05.1996 | [1998/10] | WO1996EP02044 | Priority number, date | DE1995117410 | 13.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19517410 | [1998/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9635592 | Date: | 14.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0825932 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0825932 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60J10/04, B60J10/06, B60J10/00 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
B60J10/00 (EP);
B60J10/33 (EP);
B60J10/74 (EP);
B60J10/79 (EP);
E05F15/41 (EP);
E05Y2900/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/10] | Title | German: | DICHTUNG FÜR EINE SEITENSCHEIBE EINES AUTOMOBILS | [1998/10] | English: | SEAL FOR A SIDE WINDOW OF AN AUTOMOBILE | [1998/10] | French: | JOINT D'ETANCHEITE POUR VITRE LATERALE D'UNE AUTOMOBILE | [1998/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 22.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 14.07.1999 | IT | 14.07.1999 | SE | 14.07.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/27] | ES | 14.07.1999 | |
SE | 14.07.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 14.07.1999 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0322286 (MESNEL SA ETS [FR]) [X] 1-5,10,11 * columns 4-5; figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP0336786 (MESNEL SA ETS [FR]) [X] 1 * column 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US1919130 (REID JAMES S) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US1934816 (RANDALL HOWARD D) [A] 6-9 * figure 1 * |