EP0828768 - HOMOPOLYMERS AND COPOLYMERS OF CATIONICALLY POLYMERIZABLE MONOMERS AND METHOD OF THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 3935 Embassy Parkway Akron, Ohio 44333-1799 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states The B.F. Goodrich Company 3935 Embassy Parkway Akron, Ohio 44333-1799 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOODALL, Brian, L. 3959 Clover Hill Road Akron, OH 44333 / US | 02 /
MC INTOSH, Lester, H., III 928 Chestnut Boulevard Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44221 / US | 03 /
BARNES, Dennis, A. 3888 Huffman Road Medina, OH 44256 / US | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 96914596.0 | 20.05.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996US06523 | Priority number, date | US19950448961 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: US 448961 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637529 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828768 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828768 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08F232/00, C08F210/00, C08F236/00, C08F216/12, C08F226/12, C08G61/00 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
C08G61/08 (EP,US);
C08F232/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/10 (EP,US);
C08F210/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F212/08 (EP,US);
C08F216/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08F226/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08F236/00 (KR);
C08F236/10 (EP,US);
C08G61/00 (KR);
C08F110/10 (EP,US);
C08F210/12 (EP,US);
C08F212/12 (EP,US);
C08F2410/03 (EP,US);
C08F4/61925 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/70 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/7004 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/7006 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/7016 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/7052 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/7086 (EP,US);
C08F212/08, C08F4/61925 (US,EP);
C08F236/10, C08F4/7098 (US,EP);
C08F110/10, C08F2500/01 (US,EP);
C08F210/12, C08F236/08, C08F2500/01 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/12] | Title | German: | POLYMERE UND COPOLYMERE AUS KATIONISCH POLYMERISIERBAREN MONOMEREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [1998/12] | English: | HOMOPOLYMERS AND COPOLYMERS OF CATIONICALLY POLYMERIZABLE MONOMERS AND METHOD OF THEIR PREPARATION | [1998/12] | French: | HOMOPOLYMERES ET COPOLYMERES ISSUS DE MONOMERES POLYMERISABLES PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE DU CATION ET PROCEDE VISANT A LEUR PRODUCTION | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 09.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.04.2001 | BE | 18.04.2001 | CH | 18.04.2001 | FI | 18.04.2001 | LI | 18.04.2001 | NL | 18.04.2001 | DK | 18.07.2001 | PT | 18.07.2001 | SE | 18.07.2001 | GR | 20.07.2001 | ES | 30.10.2001 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 18.04.2001 | |
BE | 18.04.2001 | ||
CH | 18.04.2001 | ||
FI | 18.04.2001 | ||
LI | 18.04.2001 | ||
NL | 18.04.2001 | ||
DK | 18.07.2001 | ||
PT | 18.07.2001 | ||
SE | 18.07.2001 | ||
ES | 30.10.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 18.04.2001 | |
BE | 18.04.2001 | ||
CH | 18.04.2001 | ||
FI | 18.04.2001 | ||
LI | 18.04.2001 | ||
NL | 18.04.2001 | ||
DK | 18.07.2001 | ||
PT | 18.07.2001 | ||
SE | 18.07.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 18.04.2001 | |
BE | 18.04.2001 | ||
CH | 18.04.2001 | ||
FI | 18.04.2001 | ||
LI | 18.04.2001 | ||
NL | 18.04.2001 | ||
PT | 18.07.2001 | ||
SE | 18.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 18.04.2001 | |
BE | 18.04.2001 | ||
CH | 18.04.2001 | ||
FI | 18.04.2001 | ||
LI | 18.04.2001 | ||
PT | 18.07.2001 | ||
SE | 18.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 18.04.2001 | |
BE | 18.04.2001 | ||
CH | 18.04.2001 | ||
FI | 18.04.2001 | ||
LI | 18.04.2001 | ||
SE | 18.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 18.04.2001 | |
BE | 18.04.2001 | ||
SE | 18.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | BE | 18.04.2001 | |
SE | 18.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 18.07.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1361677 (US RUBBER CO) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DY]US3330815 (MCKEON JAMES E, et al) [DY] 1-72 * column 1, line 58 - column 3, line 20 * * column 3, line 49 - column 7, line 39 * * column 8, line 19 - column 10, line 17 * * column 15, line 60 - column 17, line 48 * * column 19, line 33 - column 20, line 31; claims 1-40 *; | [DY]EP0445755 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [DY] 1-72 * page 4, line 53 - page 5, line 30 * * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 42 * * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 19; claims 1-16 *; | [DX]EP0504418 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [DX] 1 * page 5, line 32 - line 34 * * page 7, line 38 - line 58 * * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 14 * * page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 43 * * page 11, line 54 - page 13, line 11; claims 1-21 *; | [Y]EP0610813 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-72 * claims 1-25 *; | [PX]WO9514048 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [PX] 1-72 * claims 1-121 * |