EP0824777 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE STATIC AND DYNAMIC SUPPORT OF A MAINS VOLTAGE BY MEANS OF A STATIC COMPENSATOR WITH A SELF-COMMUTATED CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINHOLD, Michael Krähenhorst 21 D-91056 Erlangen / DE | [1998/09] | Application number, filing date | 96914849.3 | 07.05.1996 | [1998/09] | WO1996DE00792 | Priority number, date | DE1995116604 | 09.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19516604 | [1998/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9636097 | Date: | 14.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0824777 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0824777 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/18 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
H02J3/1842 (EP,US);
Y02E40/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1998/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STATISCHEN UND DYNAMISCHEN STÜTZUNG EINER NETZSPANNUNG MITTELS EINER STATISCHEN KOMPENSATIONSEINRICHTUNG MIT EINEM SELBSTGEFÜHRTEN STROMRICHTER | [1998/09] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE STATIC AND DYNAMIC SUPPORT OF A MAINS VOLTAGE BY MEANS OF A STATIC COMPENSATOR WITH A SELF-COMMUTATED CONVERTER | [1998/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SOUTIEN STATIQUE ET DYNAMIQUE D'UNE TENSION DE RESEAU A L'AIDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE COMPENSATION STATIQUE POURVU D'UN CONVERTISSEUR AUTOCOMMUTE | [1998/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 13.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3429116 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0476618 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column A; figure 3 *; | [A]US5187427 (ERDMAN WILLIAM L [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 32; figure 5 * |