EP0791159 - DEVICE FOR HEATING WATER FOR HEATING PURPOSES AND FOR DOMESTIC CONSUMPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1997/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZ, Hans-Jochen Haselbrunnenweg 10 D-73614 Schorndorf / DE | 02 /
DINKELACKER, Michael Innsbrucker Strasse 54 D-70329 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
KLINK, Hans-Joachim Erkenbergweg 14 D-73235 Weilheim / DE | [1997/35] | Application number, filing date | 96914850.1 | 07.05.1996 | [1997/35] | WO1996DE00793 | Priority number, date | DE1995133729 | 12.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19533729 | [1997/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9710472 | Date: | 20.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0791159 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0791159 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F23N1/08, F24D19/10 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
F24D19/1066 (EP,KR,US);
F23N1/08 (KR);
F23N1/085 (EP);
F23N1/087 (EP);
F23N2235/12 (EP);
F23N2235/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT [1997/35] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM ERWÄRMEN VON HEIZUNGSWASSER UND BEREITEN VON BRAUCHWASSER | [1997/35] | English: | DEVICE FOR HEATING WATER FOR HEATING PURPOSES AND FOR DOMESTIC CONSUMPTION | [1997/35] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LE CHAUFFAGE D'EAU DE CHAUFFAGE ET D'EAU SANITAIRE | [1997/35] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 10.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1187601 (JUNKERS & CO [DE]) [A] 1* page 2, paragraph 3; figure . *; | [A]DE1679365 (JUNKERS & CO) [A] 1 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 2; figure 1 * |