blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0828936

EP0828936 - INJECTION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.03.2001 [2001/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KLÜGL, Wendelin
Föhrenstrasse 1
D-92358 Seubersdorf / DE
[1998/12]
Application number, filing date96914853.511.05.1996
[1998/12]
WO1996DE00818
Priority number, dateDE199511919124.05.1995         Original published format: DE 19519191
[1998/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9637698
Date:28.11.1996
Language:DE
[1996/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0828936
Date:18.03.1998
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0828936
Date:22.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.11.1996
ClassificationIPC:F02M51/06, F02M47/06
[1998/12]
CPC:
F02M51/005 (EP); F02M47/06 (EP); F02M51/0603 (EP);
F02M2200/704 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1998/12]
TitleGerman:EINSPRITZVENTIL[1998/12]
English:INJECTION VALVE[1998/12]
French:SOUPAPE D'INJECTION[1998/12]
Entry into regional phase20.11.1997National basic fee paid 
20.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/12]
13.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.1999Fee for grant paid
05.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5335861  (MATUSAKA MASANOBU [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 24; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE4119467  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3936619  (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 17, line 31 - column 18, line 43; figure 13 *;
 [A]US5169067  (MATSUSAKA MASANOBU [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.