EP0819203 - SUPPORT DEVICE FOR AT LEAST ONE ELASTICALLY DEFORMABLE SECURING ELEMENT AND A PROCESS FOR SECTION-CONCRETING USING ELASTICALLY DEFORMABLE SECURING ELEMENTS AS A CONCRETE CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Betomax Kunststoff- und Metallwarenfabrik GmbH. & Co. KG. Dyckhofstr. 1 D-41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states Betomax Kunststoff- und Metallwarenfabrik GmbH. & Co. KG. Dyckhofstr. 1 D-41460 Neuss / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOTARFRANCESCO, Thomas Sonnenberger Strasse 28 D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
BREUER, Eckard Wienenfeldstrasse D-41068 Mönchengladbach / DE | 03 /
DAVID, Ferdinand Furtherhofstrasse 43 D-41462 Neuss / DE | 04 /
SEGGER, Theodor Blausteinsweg 12 D-41472 Neuss / DE | 05 /
TOLKSDORF, Alfred Genossenschaftsplatz 2 D-45144 Essen / DE | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Schumacher, Horst, et al Palgen, Schumacher & Kollegen Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [1998/04] | Schumacher, Horst, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte, PALGEN SCHUMACHER & KLUIN, Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96914882.4 | 04.04.1996 | [1998/04] | WO1996EP01487 | Priority number, date | DE19952005789U | 04.04.1995 Original published format: DE 29505789 U | [1998/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9631671 | Date: | 10.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0819203 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819203 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/05] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0819203 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E04G21/14 | [1998/04] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1998/43] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERWAHREN MINDESTENS EINER ELASTISCH VERFORMBAREN HALTERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABSCHNITTWEISEN BETONIEREN UNTER VERWENDUNG ELASTISCH VERFORMBARER HALTERUNGEN ALS BETONIERANSCHLUSS | [1998/04] | English: | SUPPORT DEVICE FOR AT LEAST ONE ELASTICALLY DEFORMABLE SECURING ELEMENT AND A PROCESS FOR SECTION-CONCRETING USING ELASTICALLY DEFORMABLE SECURING ELEMENTS AS A CONCRETE CONNECTION | [1998/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN D'AU MOINS UN ELEMENT DE FIXATION ELASTIQUEMENT DEFORMABLE ET PROCEDE DE BETONNAGE PAR SECTION UTILISANT DE TELS ELEMENTS DE FIXATION COMME JONCTION DE BETONNAGE | [1998/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 05.11.1997 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.12.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 15.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, GR, IE, IT, MC, PT | 07.09.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.10.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 31.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Pfeifer Seil- und Hebetechnik GmbH Dr.-Karl-Lenz-Str. 66 87700 Memmingen / DE Opponent's representative Pfister, Helmut Pfister & Pfister Patent-& Rechtsanwälte Hallhof 6-7 87700 Memmingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Pfeifer Seil- und Hebetechnik GmbH Dr.-Karl-Lenz-Str. 66 87700 Memmingen / DE Opponent's representative Pfister, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Pfister & Pfister, Patentanwälte, Herrenstrasse 11 87700 Memmingen / DE | 10.12.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.03.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.09.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.01.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.01.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.02.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.07.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.03.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.1998 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 03.02.1999 | LU | 04.04.1999 | BE | 30.04.1999 | [2007/29] |
Former [2004/39] | FI | 03.02.1999 | |
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
LU | 04.04.2001 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 03.02.1999 | |
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | BE | 30.04.1999 | |
FI | 04.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | FI | 04.05.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1684254U (MEHRLICH HEINRICH [DE]); | [A]EP0024697 (SIGMA BAUELEMENTE GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE3322646 (PHILIPP GMBH GEB [DE]); | [A]CH666931 (HOFF WALTER); | [DA]EP0534475 (PHILIPP GMBH GEB [DE]) |