EP0824683 - APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING THE POWDER DENSITY ON A DUSTY PRINTED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Platsch GmbH & Co. KG Kupferstrasse 40 70565 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Platsch, Hans G. Kupferstrasse 40 70565 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/01] |
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states Platsch GmbH & Co. KG Kupferstrasse 40 70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states PLATSCH, Hans G. Kupferstrasse 40 70565 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states KLASCHKA GMBH & CO. Postfach 1122 75229 Tiefenbronn / DE | ||
For all designated states PLATSCH, Hans G. Kupferstrasse 40 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLATSCH, Hans Kupferstrasse 40 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
KIESSLING, Albert Haldenstrasse 21 D-71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | 03 /
HERING, Guido Talstrasse 36 D-75233 Tiefenbronn / DE | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Ostertag, Ulrich, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestrasse 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Ostertag, Ulrich, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10 70597 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1998/09] | Ostertag, Ulrich Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96914974.9 | 22.04.1996 | [1998/09] | WO1996EP01680 | Priority number, date | DE1995116188 | 07.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19516188 | [1998/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9635939 | Date: | 14.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0824683 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0824683 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/47, G01N21/88, B05B12/00, B05C11/02, B41F23/06 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
B41F23/06 (EP,US);
B41F33/0036 (EP,US);
G01N15/1468 (EP,US);
G01N2015/0096 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1486 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1493 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1998/09] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER PUDERDICHTE AUF EINEM BESTÄUBTEN DRUCKERZEUGNIS | [1998/09] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING THE POWDER DENSITY ON A DUSTY PRINTED ARTICLE | [1998/09] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LA DETERMINATION DE LA DENSITE D'UNE POUDRE SUR UN PRODUIT IMPRIME SAUPOUDRE | [1998/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 01.10.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 02.01.2003 | AT | 22.04.2003 | CH | 30.04.2003 | LI | 30.04.2003 | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/22] | NL | 02.01.2003 | |
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | NL | 02.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0257749 (DE LA RUE SYST [GB]) [A] 1,2* claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5276481 (KINOSHITA NAOYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - line 56 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 11 *; | [XA]US5317380 (ALLEMAND CHARLY D [US]) [X] 1,6,9 * column 1, line 12 - line 14 * * column 6, line 2 - line 3 * * column 6, line 23 - line 24 * * column 9, line 20 - line 66; figures 2,9 * [A] 7,8 |