EP0827494 - COMPOSITIONS OF ENANTIOMERIC DIACYL TARTARIC ANHYDRIDES AND PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V. Huizerstraatweg 28 1411 GP Naarden / NL | [1998/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COENDERS, Peter, Joannes Pearl Buckerf 98 NL-3315 BB Dordrecht / NL | 02 /
GALEMA, Saskia, Alexandra Bernweg 173 NL-3137 NC Vlaardingen / NL | 03 /
GOMBERT, Johannes, Durk Kerkpad 10 NL-6883 AA Velp / NL | 04 /
MEER, Anna, Sophie, E., ter Aalscholverlaan 266 NL-3136 KL Vlaardingen / NL | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Kraag, Frank, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Kraag, F., Ir., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1998/11] | Graham, John George, et al ICI Group Intellectual Property P.O. Box 90 Wilton Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96915030.9 | 06.05.1996 | [1998/11] | WO1996EP01934 | Priority number, date | EP19950201233 | 12.05.1995 Original published format: EP 95201233 | [1998/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9635658 | Date: | 14.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0827494 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0827494 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C59/347, C07C51/567 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
C07C59/347 (EP,US);
C07C51/567 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/567, C07C59/347 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/11] | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNGEN VON ENANTIOMEREN DIACYL-WEINSÄUREANHYDRIDEN UND DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1998/11] | English: | COMPOSITIONS OF ENANTIOMERIC DIACYL TARTARIC ANHYDRIDES AND PREPARATION THEREOF | [1998/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ANHYDRIDES DIACYLTARTRIQUES ENANTIOMERES ET LEUR PREPARATION | [1998/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 03.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2628238 (PATRICK JR TRACY M) [A] 1* claim 1 * |