EP0823957 - AUTO REVERSE POWER CLOSURE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 3000 University Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2356 / US | [1998/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEORGIN, Elizabeth, A. 29, Ile de Beauté F-94130 Nogent-sur-Marne / FR | [1998/08] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1998/08] | Portwich, Peter c/o ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 96915438.4 | 01.05.1996 | [1998/08] | WO1996US06095 | Priority number, date | US19950434619 | 04.05.1995 Original published format: US 434619 | [1998/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9635036 | Date: | 07.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0823957 | Date: | 18.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823957 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/00 | [1998/08] | CPC: |
H02H7/0851 (EP,US);
E05F15/41 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,US);
H02H7/093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1998/08] | Title | German: | KRAFTBETÄTIGTES VERSCHLUSSSYSTEM MIT AUTOMATISCHER RICHTUNGSUMKEHR | [1998/08] | English: | AUTO REVERSE POWER CLOSURE SYSTEM | [1998/08] | French: | SYSTEME DE FERMETURE MECANIQUE A INVERSION DE MARCHE AUTOMATIQUE | [1998/08] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/08] | 17.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB2198860 (JIDOSHA DENKI KOGYO KK) [X] 1 * page 25, line 12 - line 20 * * page 27, line 21 - page 28, line 1 * * page 28, paragraph L - page 29, paragraph 1 *[A] 3,5; | [XA]GB2267161 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 4 * * page 13, line 24 - page 14, line 10 * [A] 3,5 |