EP0828843 - RECOMBINANT HEREGULINS AND THEIR BIOLOGICAL FUNCTIONS UPON RECEPTOR ACTIVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY P.O. Box 4000 Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CULOUSCOU, Jean-Michel 39, rue de Verdun F-78110 Le Vésinet / FR | 02 /
CARLTON, Gary, W. Apartment 403-411 West Republician Seattle, WA 98119 / US | 03 /
ARUFFO, Alejandro, A. 1012 Spruce Street Edmonds, WA 98020 / US | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/12] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96915791.6 | 14.05.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996US06861 | Priority number, date | US19950441863 | 16.05.1995 Original published format: US 441863 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9636720 | Date: | 21.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828843 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, C12N15/12, C07K14/475, A61K38/18 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
C07K14/4756 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/475 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/12] | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTE HEREGULINE UND IHRE BIOLOGISCHE FUNKTIONEN NACH REZEPTORAKTIVIERUNG | [1998/12] | English: | RECOMBINANT HEREGULINS AND THEIR BIOLOGICAL FUNCTIONS UPON RECEPTOR ACTIVATION | [1998/12] | French: | HEREGULINES DE RECOMBINAISON ET LEURS FONCTIONS BIOLOGIQUES LORS DE L'ACTIVATION D'UN RECEPTEUR | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 12.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/24] | 08.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0329175 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * page 3, line 4 - line 10 *; | [DX] - W.E.HOLMES ET AL., "Identification of heregulin, a specific activator of p185erbB2", SCIENCE, LANCASTER, PA US, (19920522), vol. 256, pages 1205 - 1210, XP002015659 [DX] 20 * page 1209, column L, line 15 - line 24 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.256.5060.1205 | [YA] - A.ARUFFO ET AL., "CD44 is the principal cell surface receptor for hyaluronate", CELL, NA US, (19900629), vol. 61, pages 1303 - 1313, XP002015660 [Y] 1,2 * see page 1310: CD5-IgG1 Vector Construction * [A] 3-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(90)90694-A | [PX] - J-M CULOUSCOU ET AL., "HER4 receptor activation and phosphorylation of Shc proteins by recombinant heregulin-Fc fusion proteins", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, MD US, (19950526), vol. 270, no. 21, pages 12857 - 12863, XP002015661 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.21.12857 |