Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3377213B | Global Dossier | 17.02.2003 | B2 | JPH11505932 | 25.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19520178 | 01.06.1995 | DE9600963 | 31.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0875000 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2000 | B1 | EP0875000 | 04.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19520178 | 01.06.1995 | DE9600963 | 31.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59604974D1 | 18.05.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19520178 | 01.06.1995 | DE9600963 | 31.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6020738 | 01.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19520178 | 01.06.1995 | DE9600963 | 31.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9638740 | Global Dossier | 05.12.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19520178 | 01.06.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19520178 | 05.12.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19520178 | 01.06.1995 |