EP0875000 - DEVICE FOR MAGNETISING MAGNETORESISTIVE THIN FILM SENSOR ELEMENTS IN A BRIDGE CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN BERG, Hugo Dr.-Da ler-Strasse 4 D-91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 02 /
SCHELTER, Wolfgang Eichendorffstrasse 7 D-91080 Uttenreuth / DE | [1998/45] | Application number, filing date | 96915958.1 | 31.05.1996 | [1998/45] | WO1996DE00963 | Priority number, date | DE1995120178 | 01.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19520178 | [1998/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9638740 | Date: | 05.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0875000 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0875000 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/09 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
G01R33/093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/45] | Title | German: | MAGNETISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MAGNETORESISTIVE DÜNNSCHICHT-SENSORELEMENTE IN EINER BRÜCKENSCHALTUNG | [1998/45] | English: | DEVICE FOR MAGNETISING MAGNETORESISTIVE THIN FILM SENSOR ELEMENTS IN A BRIDGE CONNECTION | [1998/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AIMANTATION D'ELEMENTS CAPTEURS MAGNETORESISTIFS A COUCHE MINCE DANS UN MONTAGE EN PONT | [1998/45] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3442278 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) |