EP0777915 - REDUCED VOLTAGE DELAY ADDITIVE FOR NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE IN ALKALI METAL ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WILSON GREATBATCH LTD. 10,000 Wehrle Drive Clarence, NY 14031 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states WILSON GREATBATCH LTD. 10,000 Wehrle Drive Clarence New York 14031 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEUCHI, Esther S. 38 San Rafael Court East Amherst, NY 14051 / US | 02 /
WALSH, Karen M. 11680 Liberia Road Marilla, NY 14102 / US | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1997/24] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen Mathys & Squire, 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96916461.5 | 14.05.1996 | [1997/24] | WO1996US06781 | Priority number, date | US19950462175 | 05.06.1995 Original published format: US 462175 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9639723 | Date: | 12.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777915 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777915 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01M6/00, H01M6/16 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
H01M6/168 (EP,US);
H01M6/162 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/24] | H01M6/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/24] | Title | German: | ZUSATZ FÜR TROCKENE ELEKTROLYTEN ZUR VERMINDERUNG DER SPANNUNGSVERZÖGERUNG IN ALKALI-METALLELEKTROCHEMISCHER ZELLE | [1997/24] | English: | REDUCED VOLTAGE DELAY ADDITIVE FOR NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE IN ALKALI METAL ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL | [1997/24] | French: | ADDITIF POUR UN ELECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX DANS UNE CELLULE ELECTROCHIMIQUE A METAL ALCALIN, PERMETTANT DE DIMINUER LE RETARD DE TENSION | [1997/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.1997 | Search fee paid | 06.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 01.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02168562 ; | [X]JPS59134567 ; | [PX]JPH0864246 ; | [DA]US4085256 (DEY ARABINDA N) [DA] 1-22* the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900917), vol. 014, no. 433, Database accession no. (E - 0979), & JP02168562 A 19900628 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,3,5,7-11,13,15-22 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841204), vol. 008, no. 264, Database accession no. (E - 282), & JP59134567 A 19840802 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [X] 1-3,5,7-11,13,15 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08064246 A 19960308 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [PX] 1,3 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4528254 (WOLF JAMES F [US], et al); | [X]US4853304 (EBNER WALTER B [US], et al); | [Y]US5130211 (WILKINSON DAVID P [CA], et al) |