EP0850267 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SEPARATING POLYMER FROM A PLASTIC, AND THE RESULTING SEPARATED POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CF TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Suite 200, One Westinghouse Plaza Hyde Park, MA 02136-2059 / US | [1998/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farmer, Peter H. 70 Avondale Road,Longmeadow Massachusetts 01106 / US | 02 /
Moses, John M. 105 Vincent Road, Dedham Massachusettes 02026 / US | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Jones, Graham Henry Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Jones, Graham H. Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath London SE3 7LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 96916521.6 | 21.05.1996 | [1998/27] | WO1996US07346 | Priority number, date | US19950509110 | 01.08.1995 Original published format: US 509110 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9705194 | Date: | 13.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0850267 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08J11/04, C08J11/08, C08F6/12, C08F6/28, C08L29/14 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
B29B17/02 (EP,US);
B01D11/0203 (EP,US);
C08J11/06 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0293 (EP,US);
B29K2031/04 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0038 (EP,US);
B29K2105/065 (EP,US);
B29K2709/08 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7782 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR ABTRENNUNG EINES POLYMERS VON KUNSTSTOFF UND SOMIT ERHALTEND POLYMER | [1998/27] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SEPARATING POLYMER FROM A PLASTIC, AND THE RESULTING SEPARATED POLYMER | [1998/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE SEPARER UN POLYMERE D'UN PLASTIC, ET POLYMERE SEPARE AINSI OBTENU | [1998/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.1998 | Search fee paid | 23.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 15.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/34] | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2000 | 31.05.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05112647 ; | [X]JPS60210605 ; | [X]US4918160 (KONDOH SHIGEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-7,13-15 * claim 1 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, lines 39-43 *; | [A]DE4229711 (HUELS TROISDORF [DE]) [A] 1,11* column 3, lines 13-34 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930824), vol. 017, no. 462, & JP05112647 A 00000000 (TOSOH CORP) [X] 1,5-7,13-15 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860320), vol. 10, no. 071, & JP60210605 A 00000000 (NIHON SEKIYU KAGAKU KK) [X] 1,5-7,13-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]US3256212 (GROVER MARTIN M, et al); | [X]DE3323940 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [Y]US5233021 (SIKORSKI MATHEW E [US]); | [X]US5237048 (MIYAKAWA HISASHI [JP], et al); | [X]US5306807 (KAILASAM GANESH [US], et al) |