EP0840633 - UNITARY TIP AND BALLOON FOR TRANSURETHRAL CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UROLOGIX, INC. 14405 21st Avenue North Minneapolis, MN 55447 / US | [1998/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOME, Scott, P. 535 Aberdeen Drive Waite Park, MN 56387 / US | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Patrice Vidon, Immeuble Germanium, 80, Avenue des Buttes-de-Coesmes 35700 Rennes / FR | Application number, filing date | 96916732.9 | 29.05.1996 | [1998/20] | WO1996US07919 | Priority number, date | US19950468801 | 06.06.1995 Original published format: US 468801 | [1998/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9639219 | Date: | 12.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0840633 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/00, A61M25/00, A61N5/02 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
A61M25/0017 (EP,US);
A61M25/001 (EP,US);
A61M25/0068 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1093 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1096 (EP,US);
A61M25/0023 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/20] | A61M29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/20] | Title | German: | EINHEITSSPITZE UND BALLON FÜR TRANSURETHRALEN KATHETER | [1998/20] | English: | UNITARY TIP AND BALLOON FOR TRANSURETHRAL CATHETER | [1998/20] | French: | POINTE ET BALLONNET EN UNE SEULE PIECE POUR CATHETER TRANSURETRAL | [1998/20] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 22.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 20.05.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4361152 (PATEL BHUPENDRA C) [X] 1,2,5-10 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 62 * * figures 2,4,6 * [Y] 3; | [Y]FR2407001 (KENDALL & CO [US]) [Y] 3 * page 3, line 26 - line 33; figure 6 *; | [A]US3865666 (SHONEY SURYAKANT R) [A] 1,9,10 * figures 4,5 * | International search | [X]US4777951 (CRIBIER ALAIN [FR], et al); | [X]US4850969 (JACKSON JEROME [US]) | by applicant | US4813429 | US4967765 | EP0370890 | US5413588 |