EP0835136 - SKIN PERMEATION ENHANCER COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING GLYCEROL MONOLAURATE AND LAURYL ACETATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALZA Corporation 1900 Charleston Road, P.O. Box 7210 Mountain View, CA 94039-7210 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states ALZA CORPORATION 1900 Charleston Road, P.O. Box 7210 Mountain View, CA 94039-7210 / US | ||
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states ALZA CORPORATION 950 Page Mill Road P.O. Box 10950 Palo Alto California 94303-0802 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURKOTH, Terry, L. 711 Torreya Court Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
TASKOVICH, Lina, T. 751 Gailen Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 03 /
CRISOLOGO, Nieves, Marzan 787 Madrone Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 04 /
BESTE, Russell 381 Farley Street Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 05 /
HAMLIN, Richard, D. 7471 Braidburn Avenue Newark, CA 94560 / US | 06 /
GALE, Robert, M. 1276 Russel Avenue Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 07 /
LEE, Eun, Soo 108 Danbury Lane Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 08 /
YUM, Su, Il 1021 Runnymead Court Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Williams, Paul Edwin, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | Williams, Paul Edwin, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [1998/16] | Stebbing, Peter John Hunter Ablett & Stebbing 45 Lancaster Mews Lancaster Gate London W2 3QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96916825.1 | 30.05.1996 | [1998/16] | WO1996US08105 | Priority number, date | US19950481549 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 481549 | [1998/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9640259 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0835136 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835136 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/14, A61K31/5517, A61P25/22 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
A61K9/7053 (EP,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/7069 (EP,US);
A61K9/7084 (EP,US);
A61P25/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/16] | A61K47/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2006/30] |
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | GLYCERINMONOLAURAT UND LAURYLACETAT ENTHALTENDE MITTEL ZUR HAUTPENETRATIONSBESCHLEUNIGUNG | [1998/16] | English: | SKIN PERMEATION ENHANCER COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING GLYCEROL MONOLAURATE AND LAURYL ACETATE | [1998/16] | French: | COMPOSITIONS STIMULATRICES DE PERMEATION CUTANEE, COMPRENANT DU MONOLAURATE DE GLYCEROL ET DE L'ACETATE DE LAURYLE | [1998/16] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 09.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.11.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05022250.4 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 13.11.2005 | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Request for further processing for: | 27.01.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.02.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2006 | FI | 26.07.2006 | DK | 26.10.2006 | SE | 26.10.2006 | GR | 27.10.2006 | PT | 26.12.2006 | [2008/21] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 26.07.2006 | |
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/16] | FI | 26.07.2006 | |
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0279986 (ALZA CORP [US]) [Y] 1-40 * abstract * * example - * * claim - *; | [Y]US4954487 (COOPER EUGENE R [US], et al) [Y] 1-40 * column A * * example 15 *; | [YX]US5162410 (SWEET RANDALL P [US]) [Y] 1-40 * column A * * example - * * claim - * [X] 5-8,11,12; | [YX]US5352456 (FALLON RENEE A [US], et al) [Y] 1-40 * column A * * claim 14 * [X] 5-8,11,12; | [Y]WO9509006 (ALZA CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-40 * abstract * * example - * * claim - *; | [Y] - SHAH, HEMANSHU S. ET AL, "Enhancement of in vitro skin permeation of verapamil", DRUG DEV. IND. PHARM., (1992), vol. 18, no. 13, pages 1461 - 1476, XP000615387 [Y] 1-40 * abstract * * table 1 * * page 1470 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/03639049209040852 |