EP0833623 - METHOD FOR TREATING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2001 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARRIS, Richard Y. 2075 County Road 22 Woodland Park, CO 80863 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states Harris, Richard Y. 2075 County Road 22 Woodland Park, CO 80863 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1998/15] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96917178.4 | 05.06.1996 | [1998/15] | WO1996US08900 | Priority number, date | US19950486299 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 486299 | [1998/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9640095 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0833623 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K38/215 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/135, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/135, A61K31/13 (US,EP);
A61K38/215, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/215, A61K31/135 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/15] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN FUER MULTIPLE SKLEROSE | [1998/15] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS | [1998/15] | French: | METHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA SCLEROSE EN PLAQUES | [1998/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 07.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 01.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/29] | 02.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/31] | 05.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YP]US5453428 (KAMINSKI RAM [US]) | [X] - NEUROLOGY, Vol. 41, (Suppl. I), March 1991, DESROULEAUX et al., "Fatigue in Multiple Sclerosis Pilot Trial of Selegiline", page 321. | [Y] - PHYSICIANS' DESK REFERENCE, 48th Edition, 1994, pages 2309-2311. | [Y] - MEDLINE ABSTRACT, No. 94348160; & ANNALS OF PHARMACOTHERAPY, CONNELLY, "Interferon Beta for Multiple Sclerosis", May 1994. |